Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Dumais, Morales, and Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child, or the District Court at a bail review or preliminary hearing involving a child, to order a specified child to be held in a secure juvenile facility pending a specified transfer determination except under specified circumstances; requiring the District Court to state the reasons on the record for a finding that detention in a secure juvenile facility would pose a substantial risk of harm to the child or others; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532710/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128478/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128478/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {128478/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-11)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {532710/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable with Amendments {128478/1 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 56
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {128478/1 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {128478/1 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-3) 59
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (128-11) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM