Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a surface mining permittee to permanently replace a certain water supply within a certain zone of dewatering influence within 45 days of the date on which the permittee knew of the water supply failure; authorizing a surface mining permittee to seek reimbursement for water supply replacement costs under certain circumstances; and providing for the construction of certain provisions of law relating to a contested case hearing.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {130312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Favorable with Amendments {130312/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-801, 15-812, 15-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM