Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions - Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Arora, Bromwell, Cardin, DeBoy, Elliott, Frank, Frick, Krebs, Pendergrass, Reznik, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, M. Washington, Weir, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a campaign finance entity to report specified information on its campaign finance reports for each contribution the entity receives; authorizing a campaign finance entity to report a maximum of a cumulative amount of $25,000 in contributions in an election cycle on its campaign finance reports without providing specified information about each contribution; requiring that contributions reported on or after January 1, 2011, shall be considered in making a specified determination under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0538 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-240, 13-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM