Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Arentz, Glass, Krebs, Malone, W. Miller, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that each unit of State government install and maintain a means of toll-free telephone communication for the purpose of conducting official State business; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Toll-Free Calling to Units - Repeal
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1201 through 10-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM