Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Healey, and Moon
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to consider whether a proposed entrance to a State highway is consistent with the comprehensive plan when determining whether to grant or deny a permit for the entrance; requiring the Administration to determine whether to grant or deny a permit based on a preponderance of specified evidence; requiring the Administration to grant or deny a permit request on or before a specified date; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0656
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-303 )
(   8-625, 8-646, 8-646.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM