Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that public school personnel, parents, and students receive educational information concerning the health effects of student use of overweight backpacks; authorizing a county board of education to allow Doctors of Chiropractic Medicine to conduct scoliosis examinations on students in the county schools; requiring school personnel to engage parent-teacher associations and students to assess matters concerning students' use of backpacks and to promote certain strategies relating to students' backpack usage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0164
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Use of Backpacks - Assessment and Reduction of Health Effects
House 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM