Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Luedtke, A. Kelly, and A. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Public Works, in consultation with specified departments, to adopt regulations that include specifications relating to indoor air quality for the occupants of relocatable classrooms constructed after July 1, 2014, that are purchased or leased using State funds.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM