Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Municipal Zoning Authority MC/PG 111-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County in the Maryland-Washington Regional District to exercise specified powers of the Prince George's County Council, sitting as the district council, and the Prince George's County Planning Board, relating to the zoning of land in the municipal corporation; authorizing a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to enact a local law regulating fences and providing that the local law may be less restrictive than specified other laws; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-709, 22-120, 22-202, 22-203, 25-210, 25-301, 25-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM