Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, B. Barnes, Gibson, Haynes, Hettleman, Jones, Korman, Lierman, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sophocleus, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain date to January 1, 2020, by which the State is required to discontinue a certain prescription drug benefit for certain retirees; authorizing certain retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan with a certain dependent to elect to have the dependent covered under a certain State prescription drug benefit plan; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to provide a certain notice to certain retirees of certain changes not later than July 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM