Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Heightened Security Interest Locations (Secure Maryland Wage Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain employees working at a heightened security interest location be paid a certain wage or combination of wages and benefits; specifying that low wages, high turnover rates, and the inexperience of many employees at certain locations hinder the ability of employees to respond to emergency situations threatening the safety, security, and welfare of the residents of the State; specifying that certain provisions of the Act do not diminish certain rights of certain covered employees; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Heightened Security Interest Locations (Secure Maryland Wage Act)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-1401 through 3-1411, 3-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page