Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the removal and impoundment of certain unlicensed junk motor vehicles and parts in Carroll County under certain circumstances; and repealing a certain prohibition and fine.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48C
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Unlicensed Junk Vehicles and Parts - Repeal
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM