Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program MC/PG 104-13
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish the Water Conservation On-Bill Financing Program; authorizing the Commission, by resolution, to issue bonds to finance or refinance specified costs of the Program; requiring the Commission to determine specified provisions of the bonds; requiring a customer to repay a specified loan through a surcharge on the customer's water and sewer usage bill; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-301 through 22-310, 25-601 through 25-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM