Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Acevero, Chang, Corderman, Jackson, and McKay
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency to report, beginning October 1, 2019 and every 2 years thereafter, to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention on certain policies and procedures related to use of force de-escalation training for its law enforcement officers; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to adopt procedures for the collection, analysis, and compilation of certain use of force de-escalation training information received from a certain law enforcement agency; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1503 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - Reports
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page