Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified buildings owned by the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to be high performance buildings under specified circumstances; exempting specified building types from specified high performance building standards; authorizing the Commission to request a specified waiver from specified high performance building standards from a specified county; requiring the Commission to disclose a specified waiver in a specified capital improvements program; etc.
Details
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790710/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {790710/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM