Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement - Exception
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Conaway, Dumais, Moon, Morales, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a specified exception to a specified notice requirement for a claim under the Local Government Tort Claims Act; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0934
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {492010/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-39)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488177/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488177/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488177/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {293525/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Conway) Adopted (25-20)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Delegates Sydnor, Queen, and Rey
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-25)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {492010/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (101-39) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {488177/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {488177/1 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {488177/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {293525/1 Withdrawn 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Conway) Adopted (25-20) 61A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) 62
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Delegates Sydnor, Queen, and Rey 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Zirkin, Raskin, and Norman 63A
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (116-25) 70
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM