Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Frush
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to use a power dredge to harvest oysters from any natural oyster bar in the State during a specified time period, subject to specified requirements and exceptions; authorizing the licensed oyster harvesters of each county to elect a county commercial oyster committee; requiring an oyster committee to develop and submit to the Department of Natural Resources a specified rotational harvest plan on or before August 1 of each year, beginning in 2021; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1001, 4-1006.2, 4-1009, 4-1009.1, 4-1012, 4-1012.1, 4-1014 through 4-1014.3, 4-1015.1, 4-1019, 4-1019.2, 4-1020, 4-1101, 4-1103, 4-1103.1, 4-1106, 4-1107, 4-1108, 4-1109, 4-11A-05, 4-11A-06, 4-11A-07, 4-11A-08, 4-11A-11, 4-1201, 4-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM