Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Bromwell, Buckel, Chang, Fennell, Folden, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jalisi, McCray, McMillan, Moon, Morgan, Patterson, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the statute of limitations from within 7 to 32 years of the date that the victim attains the age of majority in specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse; providing that a specified statute of limitations does not apply during a specified period for a person with a certificate of merit obtained from the person's attorney and a licensed psychiatrist or psychologist; requiring information in a certificate of merit for specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse to be provided by specified people; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1214 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of Damages
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM