Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McConkey, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education, on or before July 1, 2019, to establish guidelines for the implementation of dual language immersion programs in public schools; providing for the content of the guidelines; and requiring the State Board to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - Authorization
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Dual Language Immersion Program - Authorization
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM