Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge Commuters
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Minnick, and Weir
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified toll charges paid by specified individuals under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; and providing the Act apply to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0791
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM