Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Atterbeary, Dumais, Krebs, Rose, Shoemaker, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to order a specified defendant's doctor to develop a treatment plan within 5 days of the defendant's admission to a designated facility after a finding of incompetency or not criminally responsible under specified circumstances; providing that if a defendant refuses medication, the court may order a clinical review panel to convene within 14 days of the defendant's admission to the designated facility in order to review any proposed administration of psychiatric medication over the refusal of the defendant; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {922919/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Medication
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {922919/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Court-Ordered Evaluation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   3-106, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page