Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Reports - Exemption and Affidavit
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Pendergrass, Dumais, Jameson, Proctor, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Exempting a person who does not own or did not own during the preceding calendar year property that is subject to property tax from filing a specified annual report on personal property to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation; requiring the person to submit a specified affidavit to the Department on or before April 15; specifying the form and contents of the affidavit; providing that the affidavit may be submitted electronically to the Department; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM