Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Truancy Education Program - Parents and Guardians of Students
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster and Boteler
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified court to include mandatory participation in a Truancy Education Program as a condition under which the court may suspend a specified fine or prison sentence of a person who fails to see that a child attends school; requiring the Office of Pupil Personnel Services in each county to implement, to the extent that specified funds are provided in a specified State budget, a Truancy Education Program for the parents or guardians of students who are chronically truant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM