Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Female Genital Mutilation - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Afzali, Angel, Carozza, Cluster, McComas, McMillan, Morgan, Rey, Reznik, Rose, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum penalties for female genital mutilation from 5 years imprisonment or a $5,000 fine or both to 20 years imprisonment or a $10,000 fine or both; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Female Genital Mutilation - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Crimes - Female Genital Mutilation - Penalties
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
(   20-601, 20-602, 20-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page