Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Anderton, Arentz, Carozza, Cassilly, Folden, Ghrist, Grammer, Healey, Jacobs, Knotts, McDonough, Metzgar, Otto, Rey, Szeliga, Vogt, C. Wilson, K. Young, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; and providing specified exceptions.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0579
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0391 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486384/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {486384/1 Adopted 36
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text - Chapter - State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:32 AM