Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Dumais, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund to increase legal services in family law cases for certain victims; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund; requiring each grantee from the Fund to receive training on the effects of domestic violence, sexual assault, and child abuse; prohibiting a grantee from requesting that an individual waive certain rights as a condition of receiving services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {922118/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {922118/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM