Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras - Release of Information to Public
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, unless otherwise ordered by a court, a law enforcement agency that establishes a specified program to use body-worn cameras may keep any data recorded by the camera that is related to an ongoing investigation from being released to the public until after the investigation is closed; providing that, unless otherwise ordered by a court, a law enforcement agency, for a public safety purpose, may keep specified investigative data from being released to the public after an investigation is closed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-511, 3-511.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM