Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria and Lisanti
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that specified deputy sheriffs and correctional officers in the Office of the Sheriff of Harford County have the right to organize and collectively bargain with the Harford County Sheriff and Harford County Executive with regard to specified wages and benefits; authorizing specified deputy sheriffs and specified correctional officers to take specified actions in connection with specified labor organizations with regard to specified collective bargaining activities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM