Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - List of Contact Information for Governmental Unit Representatives
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Angel, Hayes, Hill, Luedtke, McDonough, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Hammen, Bromwell, Cullison, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each governmental unit that maintains public records to identify a representative who a member of the public should contact to request a public record, to maintain specified contact information and post the information on the unit's Web site or keep the information in a specified place, and annually update the information and submit it to the Office of the Attorney General; and requiring the Office to post specified information on the Office's Web site and include specified information in a specified manual.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0852
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {866884/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {866884/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {814630/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM