Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Age of Majority - Postsecondary Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Kaiser, Kelly, Morales, Morhaim, Sample-Hughes, Turner, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an individual who has attained the age of 18 years and is enrolled for at least 12 hours of credit in an institution of postsecondary education has the right to receive support and maintenance from both of the individual's parents until the individual dies, marries, is emancipated, graduates from or is no longer enrolled for at least 12 hours of credit in an institution of postsecondary education, or attains the age of 22 years.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM