Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Surety Insurance - Application for Bonds
Sponsored by
Delegate Branch
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the prohibition against a surety insurer inquiring about specified information in connection with an application for a bail bond or an immigration bond.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (114-26)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 31
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 31
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Special Order until 3/1 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 33
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (114-26) 35
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 First Reading Finance 35
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM