Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of tobacco products in school buildings, on school grounds, and inside school buses; prohibiting the use of tobacco products by specified persons at specified school-sponsored events; providing a penalty for a violation; and requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/01/2013 Text - First - Tobacco-Free Schools Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM