Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Bohanan, Braveboy, Carter, DeBoy, Eckardt, Glass, Guzzone, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, James, Kaiser, Krebs, McComas, Minnick, S. Robinson, Schulz, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Swain, V. Turner, M. Washington, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified unemployed veteran a credit of up to $2,000 against the State income tax for expenses associated with starting a business during the taxable year; requiring the business to meet specified qualifications; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations and provide an annual report; defining "qualified veteran" and "qualified expenses"; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM