Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Angel, Barkley, D. Barnes, Barron, Buckel, Carter, Chang, Clippinger, Cluster, Fennell, Frush, Ghrist, Glenn, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Knotts, Lam, Luedtke, McConkey, McKay, O'Donnell, Patterson, B. Robinson, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Vogt, Walker, A. Washington, C. Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for the membership of employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit in the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; authorizing specified employees of the Warrant Apprehension Unit to transfer membership to the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System on or before December 31, 2015; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to transfer specified funds to the annuity savings fund of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0286
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109434/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 37
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {109434/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 59
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-201, 26-202, 26-203.1, 26-203.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM