Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period - Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Miller, Brooks, Jalisi, and Lam
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a tax-free period each year during which a specified sales and use tax exemption for the sale of specified emergency preparedness items is provided; requiring the Executive Director of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to publish a specified list on or before January 1, 2017; authorizing the Executive Director to amend a specified list under specified circumstances; defining specified terms; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
(   11-228.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page