Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a public body to meet in a closed session to discuss cybersecurity if the public body determines that public discussion would constitute a risk to security assessments or deployments relating to information resources technology, certain network security information, or deployments or implementation of security personnel, critical infrastructure, or security devices.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406980/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {406980/1 Adopted 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text - Chapter - Open Meetings Act - Closed Meetings - Cybersecurity
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM