Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority - Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Davis, Barkley, Impallaria, Jameson, W. Miller, and C. Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority to collect an assessment or a charge not exceeding 5 cents per ticket under specified circumstances; specifying the circumstances under which the Authority may collect an assessment or a charge; and providing for an exception to a specified limitation regarding sources of operational funding for the Authority.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0480
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 676
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM