Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Cassilly, Barve, Lafferty, Morhaim, Rosenberg, Anderton, Beidle, Carr, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Knotts, R. Lewis, McCray, McMillan, Otto, Robinson, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law that authorize under certain circumstances, a person to plant, cultivate, process, sell, or buy industrial hemp in the State; repealing an authorization for the Department of Agriculture or an institution of higher education to grow or cultivate industrial hemp; establishing an Industrial Hemp Pilot Program to authorize and facilitate the research of industrial hemp and certain aspects for agricultural, industrial, or commercial purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {680813/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {680813/1 Adopted 35
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 37
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - Establishment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-102 )
(   2015, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM