Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Murder or Arson - Statute of Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegates Waldstreicher, McDermott, and Clippinger
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the statute of limitations for the crime of solicitation to commit murder in the first degree, murder in the second degree, or arson in the first degree, or arson in the second degree is the statute of limitations for the prosecution of the substantive crime that is the subject of the solicitation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM