Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium Increase
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified notice required under specified circumstances when an insurer seeks to increase the renewal policy premium for policies of commercial or workers' compensation insurance to be delivered by electronic means; providing that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, an insurer shall be considered to have met a specified notice requirement and is not required to deliver a specified notice required by specified provisions of law if the insurer has taken specified actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0434
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-608 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM