Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Krimm, and Hill
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to develop and make available a standardized form for a BSL-3 laboratory for specified purposes; requiring the laboratories to report specified information to the Department; requiring the Department to report, on or before December 31, 2017, and on or before December 31 each subsequent year, the number and location of the laboratories, in total and by local jurisdiction, to specified officials in the State; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0700
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {826984/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {826984/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 53
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM