Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing specified obsolete provisions of the State alcoholic beverages law, including the repeal of a requirement that the Comptroller prescribe specified maximum discounts that may be allowed by specified persons, the repeal of a requirement that the Comptroller require the filing of specified schedules of prices, the repeal of a requirement that specified persons in Baltimore City be certified by an approved alcohol awareness program, and the repeal of specified bonding requirements in Garrett County; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-102, 12-103, 13-101, 14-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page