Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Angel, Barkley, Beidle, Campos, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Hettleman, Kelly, Lam, Lierman, and Platt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in the nontherapeutic use of medically important antimicrobial drugs in specified cattle, swine, and poultry on or after October 1, 2016; requiring a specified farm operation to submit specified information under specified circumstances to the Department of Agriculture on or before October 1 each year, beginning on or before October 1, 2017; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to impose a specified penalty; providing for the application of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0463
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-1001 through 3-1005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page