Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Frick, Afzali, Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barkley, Barve, Bates, Beidle, Bobo, Branch, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, Eckardt, Feldman, Frush, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Hough, Hucker, Impallaria, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, Lee, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, W. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Olszewski, Parrott, Pendergrass, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rudolph, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stein, Stukes, Szeliga, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a State or local law enforcement agency, on process issued by a court of competent jurisdiction, to seize specified property used or intended for use in connection with a violation of specified criminal statutes relating to human trafficking; specifying the revenue sources for the Fund; providing for disbursements from the Fund for specified purposes; specifying property that is subject to forfeiture; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0391 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {132110/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {132110/1 Report Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-501 through 13-536 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM