Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Proctor, Anderson, Aumann, Barkley, Beidle, Beitzel, Bromwell, Carr, Frush, Hammen, Holmes, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kipke, Krebs, McIntosh, O'Donnell, Sophocleus, Szeliga, and Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum amount for a subtraction modification under the State income tax for military retirement income from $5,000 to $10,000 of military retirement income received; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0770 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM