Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Barnes, Bobo, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guzzone, Ivey, Luedtke, S. Robinson, Summers, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county to impose, by law, a specified fee on a store for the use of disposable carryout bags; requiring a store to charge and collect a specified fee for each disposable carryout bag the store provides to a customer under specified circumstances and in accordance with specified requirements; providing that the sales and use tax does not apply to a specified amount of money retained by a store under specified circumstances; requiring the operator of a store to remit a specified amount of money to a county; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0707
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1086 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
House 2/03/2014 2/03/2014 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM