Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Afzali, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Branch, Brooks, Buckel, Chang, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Hayes, Healey, Jalisi, Krebs, Krimm, Lafferty, Luedtke, McComas, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Stein, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Carey, Clippinger, Davis, Glenn, S. Howard, Jameson, Lisanti, Vaughn, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General to bring a civil action for damages against a specified person who violates specified provisions of law on behalf of a specified vulnerable adult; authorizing the Division to recover damages for property loss or damage; authorizing the Division to recover the costs of the action for the use of the Office of the Attorney General; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873090/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {873090/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Finance 37
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-204 )
(   8-801 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM