Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsored by
Delegate Vaughn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified requirements for the responsible member of an entity providing architectural services; authorizing the State Board of Architects to deny a firm permit to an applicant, reprimand a permit holder, suspend or revoke a permit, or impose a penalty up to $5,000 under specified circumstances and subject to specified hearing provisions; authorizing landscape architecture to be practiced through a limited liability company under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-402, 15-402.1, 15-403, 15-406, 15-407 through 15-414, 3-401, 3-403, 3-404, 3-410 through 3-416, 3-602, 9-401, 9-402, 9-403, 9-404, 9-405, 9-409, 9-409 through 9-416, 9-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM