Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Malone
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from causing the serious physical injury or death of a vulnerable individual as a result of the individual operating a vehicle in a careless or distracted manner or in violation of any provision of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining "vulnerable individual" as a pedestrian, including certain workers and emergency services personnel, an individual walking an animal, or an individual lawfully operating certain modes of transport; establishing certain financial penalties and including community service; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0512
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0804 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {100912/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/26/2020 2/27/2020 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {100912/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
(   11-101, 11-145, 21-901.3 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page