Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Frush, and Tarlau
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, for purposes of the definition of "engage in the business of an out-of-state vendor" under the sales and use tax law, a seller shall be presumed under specified circumstances to have an agent, a canvasser, an independent contractor, a representative, a salesman, or a solicitor operating in the State for the purpose of selling or taking orders; providing that the presumption may be rebutted by specified proof; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-701, 11-701.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM