Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy and Niemann
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before a specified date; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0222
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Economic Matters 23
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM